Selby v. Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America
Plaintiff: William Selby
Defendant: Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv02899
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 21 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 11/13/20. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice)(Lessmann, Ryan)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/23/2020. In light of the Parties' #18 Notice of Settlement, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 and the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2020 are hereby VACATED; the #12 Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN without prejudice as moot; and the Parties shall file an appropriate Dismissal Paper by 11/13/2020. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America (Lessmann, Ryan)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/2020. Pursuant to #11 Order, the Parties were to complete and file their Consent Form by yesterday, October 21, 2020. Having not received a completed Consent Form, a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/28/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. The court will automatically vacate the Status Conference upon the filing of a completed Consent Form. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/15/2020. Plaintiff shall serve his initial disclosures by 10/19/2020. Counsel is advised that press of business generally does not constitute good cause for an extension of time. Further, all motions must comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) and 7.1(a), as future noncompliance may result in this court striking the motion without substantive consideration. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to file disclosures by Plaintiff William Selby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Abrams, James)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Registry of Actions by Defendant Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Registry of Actions)(Lessmann, Ryan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hannover Ruck Beteiligung Verwaltungs-GmbH for Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America. (Lessmann, Ryan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Job Description, #2 Exhibit B - Will Selby - 2017 Review, #3 Exhibit C - Signed Corrective Action Form, #4 Exhibit D - Sept. 26 2018 Email Re. PIP Extension, #5 Exhibit E - PIP Extension Expectations, #6 Exhibit F - June 21 2018 FMLA Notice, #7 Exhibit G - FMLA Questionnaire Faxed on August 6 2018, #8 Exhibit H - Confidential Functional Medical Information Questionnaire, #9 Exhibit I - Capacity Questionnaire, #10 Exhibit J - Dr. Grossman Letter, #11 Exhibit K - Return to work Letter)(Lessmann, Ryan)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2 October 2020. Consent Form due by 10/21/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due10/28/2020 Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (cmadr, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert L. Allman on behalf of William SelbyAttorney Robert L. Allman added to party William Selby(pty:pla) (Allman, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James L. Abrams on behalf of William SelbyAttorney James L. Abrams added to party William Selby(pty:pla) (Abrams, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Helmsley Geneus on behalf of Hannover Life Reassurance Company of AmericaAttorney Jonathan Helmsley Geneus added to party Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Geneus, Jonathan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Paul Lessmann on behalf of Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America (Lessmann, Ryan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time. (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Amended COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America, filed by William Selby.(cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America from District Court, City and County of Denver, State of Colorado, Case Number 2020cv32248. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7505007), filed by Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Waiver and Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit E - Entry of Appearance of RPL and JHG, #6 Exhibit F - Unopposed Motion for Extension ot Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Order Granting Motion for Extension, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Docket, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lessmann, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selby v. Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Selby
Represented By: Robert L. Allman
Represented By: James L. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannover Life Reassurance Company of America
Represented By: Jonathan Helmsley Geneus
Represented By: Ryan Paul Lessmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?