Vigil v. WellPath Medical Services et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Vigil
Defendant: WellPath Medical Services and El Paso County
Case Number: 1:2020cv02936
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #8 Order of Dismissal on 11/06/2020. (athom, )
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order and failure to prosecute. IFP on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/06/2020. (athom, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Order to Cure Deficiencies to Vincent Vigil. (rvill, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Prisoner Complaint, #2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, #3 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, and 4 Case Assigned to Judge, Addressed to Vincent Vigil. (agarc, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. The Clerk of the Court mail to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this order, a blank copy of the following form: Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 (ECF No. 2) and Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed.R. App. P. 24 (ECF No. #3 ) are denied without prejudice to being refiled on the correct court-approved form. If Plaintiff is released from custody (as he suggests may happen in his Prisoner Complaint, ECF No. #1 at 2), Plaintiff must notify the Court of the change of address as required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(c). If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 09/29/2020. (athom, ) (form mailed as ordered)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 by Plaintiff Vincent Vigil. (jsalz, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. 24 by Plaintiff Vincent Vigil. (jsalz, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against El Paso County, WellPath Medical Services, filed by Vincent Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. WellPath Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPath Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?