Katt v. Mint House Inc
Plaintiff: David Katt
Defendant: Mint House Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv02941
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to #8 Notice of Settlement, the parties shall file dismissal papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 1/5/2021. The Scheduling Conference Set for 12/17/2020 09:15 AM is VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/6/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff David Katt (Marcus, Ari)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Mint House Inc.'s answer is due 11/24/2020. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 10:15 AM is VACATED and RESET for Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 09:15 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 12/3/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/10/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/19/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Mint House Inc. (Norton, Leo)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Katt. Mint House Inc served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Marcus, Ari)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/3/2020 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/19/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/26/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/29/2020. (jgonz, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MINT HOUSE INC. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7511787)Attorney Ari Hillel Marcus added to party DAVID KATT(pty:pla), filed by DAVID KATT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marcus, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katt v. Mint House Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Katt
Represented By: Ari Hillel Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mint House Inc
Represented By: Leo Patrick Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?