Realm Licensing LLC v. SugarCRM Inc.
Plaintiff: Realm Licensing LLC
Defendant: SugarCRM Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02948
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 14 Civil Case Terminated on 10 November 2020. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss SugarCRM Inc. filed by attorneys Collin J. Marshall & Neil J. McNabnay. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss SugarCRM Inc. by Counter Defendant Realm Licensing LLC, Plaintiff Realm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Realm Licensing LLC by SugarCRM Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McNabnay, Neil)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/6/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 12/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/9/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/16/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the date and time of the Scheduling/Planning Conference. Please read attached Order. (nmarb, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons Request filed by attorney Isaac Rabicoff. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENTS. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) Modified to correct text on 10/1/2020 (jtorr, ).
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 Report re Patent: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Realm Licensing LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SugarCRM Inc. by Plaintiff Realm Licensing LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SugarCRM Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7514561)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Realm Licensing LLC(pty:pla), filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realm Licensing LLC v. SugarCRM Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realm Licensing LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SugarCRM Inc.
Represented By: Neil Joseph McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?