Hooks v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maria Hooks
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02966
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Okon, Joseph)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/5/2020. Consent Form due by 11/30/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/30/2020 (jgonz, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laurence Michael Schneider on behalf of Maria HooksAttorney Laurence Michael Schneider added to party Maria Hooks(pty:pla) (Schneider, Laurence)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Amended Summons, Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, and Amended District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. on 09/01/2020. (jtorr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Maria Hooks.(jtorr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX096626 (jsalz, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Ricketson Larson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.Attorney Ashley Ricketson Larson added to party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft) (Larson, Ashley)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Okon, Joseph)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from El Paso County, Case Number 2020CV31417. (Filing fee $ 400)., filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Okon, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hooks
Represented By: Laurence Michael Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Represented By: Joseph Edward Okon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Represented By: Joseph Edward Okon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?