Kaplan v. International Used Truck Center, et al
Plaintiff: Seth Kaplan
Defendant: International Used Truck Center, Navistar, Inc. and Navistar International Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02976
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 46 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 45 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 44 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00656. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 2, 2020 Filing 42 TRANSFERRED to the USDC of Colorado the electronic record. (pj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 41 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC Colorado.(pj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. by Jeffrey S Patterson (Patterson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket2, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. by Jacob L. Ramsey (Ramsey, Jacob) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Going forward, counsel must submit all filings for member cases in this action, 14-cv-10318, but note the originating case number in parentheses in the case caption for 14-cv-10318. The court will add counsel who have appeared in the member cases, but not in 14-cv-10318, to the notification list in 14-cv-10318 to ensure electronic service of documents filed in 14-cv-10318. Mailed notice (cc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Plaintiff failed to participate in the joint status report 773 filed on 2/27/20. The record shows that plaintiff is now proceeding pro se in this matter. Notwithstanding, plaintiff is still required to submit a joint status report with defendant that addresses the issues set forth in the Court's Standing Order concerning joint status reports. The parties are therefore directed to meet and confer and to participate in the supplemental status report already required by the Court's prior order on 2/28/20. 780 . Mailed notice (cc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 34 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cummings for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision.(mjc, )Mailed notice. [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants International Used Truck Center, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. by Robin M. Hulshizer (Hulshizer, Robin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants International Used Truck Center, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. by James Friedland (Friedland, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants International Used Truck Center, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. by Garrett Stuart Long (Long, Garrett) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 30 SEALED WARRANT Returned Executed as to Stetler. (Stetler, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 28 RECEIVED from Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-03072 (jjr) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-03072 PAB-STV, to the Northern District of Illinois, to become part of MDL 2590 by Clerk on 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter) (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Dismiss /Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State Viable Claims filed by Plaintiff Seth Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/24/2019. Status Conference set for 4/4/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Parties may participate by telephone by contacting the court at (303) 335-2365 at the scheduled dateand time. FTR: STV - 402. (morti, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Toon, Adrienne) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss /Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State Viable Claims by Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Toon, Adrienne) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/18/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Patterson on behalf of All Defendants (Patterson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #16 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Jeffrey S. Patterson and Drew M. Thomas.The document is incorrectly formatted. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. The document has the incorrect court title and address. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Denver County District Court Register of Actions as of 2018-12-14 by Defendants International Used Truck Center, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. (Toon, Adrienne) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/14/2018, re: #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is DENIED. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Drew M. Thomas on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Drew M. Thomas added to party International Used Truck Center(pty:dft), Attorney Drew M. Thomas added to party Navistar International Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Drew M. Thomas added to party Navistar, Inc.(pty:dft) (Thomas, Drew) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeffrey S. Patterson and Drew M. Thomas by Jeffrey S. Patterson on behalf of International Used Truck Center, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.Attorney Jeffrey S. Patterson added to party International Used Truck Center(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S. Patterson added to party Navistar International Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S. Patterson added to party Navistar, Inc.(pty:dft) (Patterson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03072-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Seth Kaplan. (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03072-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants International Used Truck Center, Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Toon, Adrienne) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/30/2018. Consent Form due by 1/10/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (jgonz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc..(dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Cover Sheet, Delay Reduction Order, Pre-Trial Order upon Angela Hodges for Navistar, Inc. on 11/01/2018 (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc., filed by Seth Kaplan.(dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Navistar International Corporation for Navistar, Inc.. (Toon, Adrienne) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,,, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Navistar International Corporation, Navistar, Inc.. (Toon, Adrienne) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Navistar, Inc., Navistar International Corporation from District Court, City and County of Denver, State of Colorado, Case Number 2018CV33787. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6418164), filed by Navistar, Inc., Navistar International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Summons State Court, #2 Exhibit A-2 Civil Case Coversheet State Court, #3 Exhibit A-3 Complaint and Jury Demand State Court, #4 Exhibit A-4 Delay Reduction Order State Court, #5 Exhibit A-5 Pretrial Order State Court, #6 Exhibit A-6 Affidavits of Service State Court, #7 Exhibit A-7 Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand State Court, #8 Exhibit A-8 Notice to Set Trial and Case Management Conference State Court, #9 Exhibit B Register of Actions State Court)(Toon, Adrienne) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/4/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan v. International Used Truck Center, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Used Truck Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?