McMaster-Carr Supply Company v. C.I.T.C. USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: McMaster-Carr Supply Company
Defendant: C.I.T.C. USA, Inc. and Edward Sobczewski
Case Number: 1:2020cv02989
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christine Wilson Feller on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply CompanyAttorney Christine Wilson Feller added to party McMaster-Carr Supply Company(pty:pla) (Feller, Christine)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by C.I.T.C. USA, Inc., Edward Sobczewski.(Collier, Jessica)
November 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert A.H. Middleton on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply CompanyAttorney Robert A.H. Middleton added to party McMaster-Carr Supply Company(pty:pla) (Middleton, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/03/2020. Consent Form due by 12/15/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/15/2020 (evaug)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error. This case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya pursuant to. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02989-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. C.I.T.C. USA, Inc. answer due 11/17/2020; Edward Sobczewski answer due 11/17/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/20/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants C.I.T.C. USA, Inc., Edward Sobczewski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Collier, Jessica)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Clark Collier on behalf of C.I.T.C. USA, Inc., Edward SobczewskiAttorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party C.I.T.C. USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party Edward Sobczewski(pty:dft) (Collier, Jessica)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. Edward Sobczewski served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Saffer, Ian)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. C.I.T.C. USA, Inc. served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Saffer, Ian)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jgonz, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/15/2020 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 12/1/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/8/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/6/2020. (jgonz, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (cpomm, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn Lenhart Bohmann on behalf of McMaster-Carr Supply CompanyAttorney Kathryn Lenhart Bohmann added to party McMaster-Carr Supply Company(pty:pla) (Bohmann, Kathryn)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Saffer, Ian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to C.I.T.C. USA, Inc. & Edward Sobczewski re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff McMaster-Carr Supply Company. (Saffer, Ian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.I.T.C. USA, Inc., Edward Sobczewski (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7521664)Attorney Ian Lawrence Saffer added to party McMaster-Carr Supply Company(pty:pla), filed by McMaster-Carr Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Saffer, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMaster-Carr Supply Company v. C.I.T.C. USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McMaster-Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Ian Lawrence Saffer
Represented By: Kathryn Lenhart Bohmann
Represented By: Robert A.H. Middleton
Represented By: Christine Wilson Feller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.I.T.C. USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Sobczewski
Represented By: Jessica Clark Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?