Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Deezer Inc
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Deezer Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv03037
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Meet and Confer and Submit Proposed Scheduling Order. The defendant's response to the Complaint is due 12/18/2020. The proposed scheduling order is now due by 12/22/2020. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/3/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Meet and Confer and Submit Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Deezer Inc. (Featherstone, Bruce)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 12/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge MIx is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 12/3/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/30/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson, and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03037-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/242020. This matter is before the Court on the parties' Consent/Non-Consent Form [#11 ], in which the parties inform the Court that at least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (agarc, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/99/20 GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant has up to and including December 7, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (nmarb, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Deezer Inc. Deezer Inc answer due 12/7/2020. (Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 11/9/2020 to add gavel to entry pursuant to Minute Order of 11/9/20. (nmarb, ).
October 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/10/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/3/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Deezer Inc by Plaintiff Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Deezer Inc (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7530844)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc. v. Deezer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deezer Inc
Represented By: Bruce A. Featherstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?