Winslow v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: Trinity Winslow agent of d/b/a Aquariuz Mermaid Tails and Trinity Winslow an individual doing business as Aquariuz Mermaid Tails
Defendant: Ryan A Newman, Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC and Kristie E Foster
Counter Defendant: Trinity Winslow
Case Number: 1:2020cv03102
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Trinity Winslow by Ryan A Newman, Kristie E Foster, Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Lemire, Peter)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman, filed by Trinity Winslow.(Goodwin, Daniel)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather Nicole Tilley on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Heather Nicole Tilley added to party Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Nicole Tilley added to party Kristie E Foster(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Nicole Tilley added to party Ryan A Newman(pty:dft) (Tilley, Heather)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12 November 2020. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #11 ), which was docketed as a motion, is GRANTED. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1, a stipulation to an extension of 21 days or less is effective upon filing and otherwise in compliance with the rule "shall be effective on filing." A motion is not necessary for such a stipulation to be effective. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman. (Lemire, Peter)
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter C. Lemire on behalf of Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A NewmanAttorney Peter C. Lemire added to party Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter C. Lemire added to party Kristie E Foster(pty:dft), Attorney Peter C. Lemire added to party Ryan A Newman(pty:dft) (Lemire, Peter)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trinity Winslow. Ryan A Newman served on 10/25/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Goodwin, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trinity Winslow. Kristie E Foster served on 10/25/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Goodwin, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trinity Winslow. Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Goodwin, Daniel)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shirin Chahal on behalf of Trinity WinslowAttorney Shirin Chahal added to party Trinity Winslow(pty:pla) (Chahal, Shirin)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 19 October 2020. Consent Form due by 12/23/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/30/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, ).
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC, Kristie E Foster, Ryan A Newman (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7541274)Attorney Daniel Thomas Goodwin added to party Trinity Winslow(pty:pla), filed by Trinity Winslow. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Goodwin, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winslow v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan A Newman
Represented By: Heather Nicole Tilley
Represented By: Peter C. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquarius Mermaid Tails LLC
Represented By: Heather Nicole Tilley
Represented By: Peter C. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie E Foster
Represented By: Heather Nicole Tilley
Represented By: Peter C. Lemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Winslow agent of d/b/a Aquariuz Mermaid Tails
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Winslow an individual doing business as Aquariuz Mermaid Tails
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Goodwin
Represented By: Shirin Chahal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trinity Winslow
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Goodwin
Represented By: Shirin Chahal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?