Handy, Jr. v. Dobbin et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Defendant: Annalissa Reynolds, Lynnette Nederland, Bradley Murphy, Wendy Anderson, Shederick Dobbin and City and County of Denver
Case Number: 1:2020cv03132
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wendy Anderson, Shederick Dobbin, Bradley Murphy, Lynnette Nederland, Annalissa Reynolds, filed by Wyatt T. Handy, Jr..(evana, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT within thirty days from the date of this Order. That if Plaintiff fails to properly amend the Complaint, within thirty days from the date of this Order, the Complaint will be subject to dismissal, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/20/2020. (evana, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/20/2020.(evana, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). by Plaintiff Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. (jsalz, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wendy Anderson, City and County of Denver, Shederick Dobbin, Bradley Murphy, Lynnette Nederland, Annalissa Reynolds, filed by Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy, Jr. v. Dobbin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annalissa Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynnette Nederland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shederick Dobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?