Boles v. Long et al
Petitioner: Russell M. Boles
Respondent: Jeff Long and Phillip Weiser
Case Number: 1:2020cv03204
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to #9 Pre-Answer Response, by Petitioner Russell M. Boles. (rvill, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to #9 Pre-Answer Response, by Petitioner Russell M. Boles. (rvill, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Order, to file Pre-answer Response by Respondents Jeff Long, Phillip WeiserAttorney Lisa Kay Michaels added to party Jeff Long(pty:res), Attorney Lisa Kay Michaels added to party Phillip Weiser(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Appendix 1)(Michaels, Lisa)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit the Record in Support of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Russell M. Boles. (rvill, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of the Order to File Preliminary Response and an Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Jeff Long. (rvill, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #5 Order to File Pre-Answer Response, #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Service of Process. (trvo, )
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response. It is ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondents shall file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 28, 2020. (rvill, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 27, 2020.(rvill, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action. by Petitioner Russell M. Boles. (jsalz, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Russell M. Boles. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boles v. Long et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell M. Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Long
Represented By: Lisa Kay Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Phillip Weiser
Represented By: Lisa Kay Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?