Cassino v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Lance Cassino
Defendant: Serina Lee, Robert Hoffman, U.S. Bank National Association, Raymond Skerling, II, Ashley Jordan and JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv03228
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Hoffman, Raymond Skerling, II, Serina Lee, U.S. Bank National Association, JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/23/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Robert Hoffman, JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association, Serina Lee, Raymond Skerling, II, U.S. Bank National Association. (Lowery-Graber, Cynthia)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Raymond Skerling, II answer due 12/23/2020, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/23/2020.(jgonz, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Raymond Skerling, II. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/21/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Raymond Skerling, II. (Lowery-Graber, Cynthia)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter in which Plaintiff appears pro se. The Court strongly encourages Plaintiff to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic cannot assist with criminal, bankruptcy, habeas, appeals, or any state cases. If Plaintiff wishes to avail himself of this service, he may make an appointment by phone (303-380-8786) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/9/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/9/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/9/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/8/20 re: #6 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Lance Cassino. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03228-RM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff Lance Cassino only. All parties do not consent. (nmarb, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (alave, ) Modified on 11/18/2020 to correct entry. (alave, ).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/5/20. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. At least one party in this matter is currently appearing as a pro se litigant. The Federal Pro Se Clinic provides free legal assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. Pro se litigants are strongly encouraged to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic at 303-380-8786 to make an appointment to speak with a lawyer. Pro se litigants may also make an appointment online (and find additional information) at www.cobar.org/fpsc/. (nmarb, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Hoffman, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Ashley Jordan, Serina Lee, National Association, Raymond Skerling, II, U.S. Bank National Association (Filing fee: $400, Receipt Number: COX096917) filed by Lance Cassino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassino v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Cassino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serina Lee
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Lowery-Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hoffman
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Lowery-Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Lowery-Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Skerling, II
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Lowery-Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Cynthia Dawn Lowery-Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?