Basinger v. Mountain Middle School Board of Directors, et al
Plaintiff: Peter Basinger
Defendant: Natalie Barstatis, Mountain Middle School Board of Directors, Jason Austin, Brent Case, Anna Layden, Jennifer Rider, Jim McCarthy, Catherine Gervais, Robert P Montgomery, Shane Voss, Liz Cartwright, Larissa Lopez, Carrie Allen and Nicole Perino
Case Number: 1:2020cv03389
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/14/2021. ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Brent Case (Attorney) and Robert P Montgomery (Attorney) terminated. Consent Form due by 1/22/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2021 02:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jason Austin, Catherine Gervais, Larissa Lopez, Jim McCarthy, Shane Voss, Anna Layden, Liz Cartwright, Nicole Perino, Mountain Middle School Board of Directors, Carrie Allen, Natalie Barstatis, Jennifer Rider. Jason Austin waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Catherine Gervais waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Larissa Lopez waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Jim McCarthy waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Shane Voss waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Anna Layden waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Liz Cartwright waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Nicole Perino waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Mountain Middle School Board of Directors waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Carrie Allen waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Natalie Barstatis waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021; Jennifer Rider waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021. (Montgomery, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Robert P. Montgomery by Robert P. Montgomery on behalf of Carrie Allen, Jason Austin, Natalie Barstatis, Liz Cartwright, Catherine Gervais, Anna Layden, Larissa Lopez, Jim McCarthy, Mountain Middle School Board of Directors, Nicole Perino, Jennifer Rider, Shane VossAttorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Carrie Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Jason Austin(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Natalie Barstatis(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Liz Cartwright(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Catherine Gervais(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Anna Layden(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Larissa Lopez(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Jim McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Mountain Middle School Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Nicole Perino(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Jennifer Rider(pty:dft), Attorney Robert P. Montgomery added to party Shane Voss(pty:dft) (Montgomery, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Michael Brent Case by Michael Brent Case on behalf of Carrie Allen, Jason Austin, Natalie Barstatis, Liz Cartwright, Catherine Gervais, Anna Layden, Larissa Lopez, Jim McCarthy, Mountain Middle School Board of Directors, Nicole Perino, Jennifer Rider, Shane VossAttorney Michael Brent Case added to party Carrie Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Jason Austin(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Natalie Barstatis(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Liz Cartwright(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Catherine Gervais(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Anna Layden(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Larissa Lopez(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Jim McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Mountain Middle School Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Nicole Perino(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Jennifer Rider(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Shane Voss(pty:dft) (Case, Michael)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Robert Montgomery and Brent Case as Defendants by Plaintiff Peter Basinger. (cmadr, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 December 2020. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Deadline Extension (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. The December 31, 2020 consent form deadline is VACATED. It will be reset at the January 14, 2021 Status Conference. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Deadline Extension by Plaintiff Peter Basinger. (cmadr, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #4 to Peter Basinger230 Hillside Drive Moab, UT 84532. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 18 November 2020. Consent Form due by 12/31/2020. Status Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Status Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrie Allen, Jason Austin, Natalie Barstatis, Liz Cartwright, Brent Case, Catherine Gervais, Anna Layden, Larissa Lopez, Jim McCarthy, Robert P Montgomery, Mountain Middle School Board of Directors, Nicole Perino, Jennifer Rider, Shane Voss. Filing Fee: $400 Receipt Number:COX097140, filed by Peter Basinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Envelope, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basinger v. Mountain Middle School Board of Directors, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Basinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Barstatis
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Middle School Board of Directors
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Austin
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Layden
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rider
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McCarthy
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Gervais
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Voss
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Cartwright
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Lopez
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Allen
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Perino
Represented By: Robert P. Montgomery
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?