Nelson v. Coleman et al
Plaintiff: Brett Andrew Nelson
Defendant: Sarah Coleman, Donald Corwin Jackson and Jennifer L. Pacheco
Case Number: 1:2020cv03453
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT re: #10 Order on Report and Recommendations, by Clerk on 12/29/2020. (evana, )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No. #8 ) is accepted and adopted. That the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and the action are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). That leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith., by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/29/2020.(evana, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Brett Andrew Nelson. (evana, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and the action be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), by Magistrate Judge Kirsten L. Mix on 12/4/2020. (evana, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE This action is under review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/4/2020. (evana, )
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/3/2020. (evana, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. After reviewing the case file and because I appear before one of the Defendants in private practice, I conclude that I should recuse myself from further service in this case. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/2/2020. (evana, )
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/23/2020.(evana, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Brett Andrew Nelson. (cpomm, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sarah Coleman, Donald Corwin Jackson, Jennifer L. Pacheco, filed by Brett Andrew Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Corwin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Andrew Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?