Haedoug LLC v. Kenworth Truck Company
Plaintiff: Haedoug LLC a/k/a Douglas Gonzalez, Haedoug LLC and Douglas Gonzales
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Company, a division of PACCAR Inc and Kenworth Truck Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv03511
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bw
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 2/10/2021 11:00 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The parties shall submit a joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 2/3/2021 and shall submit the Magistrate Consent/Nonconsent form on or before 1/27/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/17/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Estes, David)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/28/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 1/14/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/21/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/2/2020. (jgonz, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-3511-STV (angar, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit D)(Estes, David)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Drew M. Thomas on behalf of Kenworth Truck CompanyAttorney Drew M. Thomas added to party Kenworth Truck Company(pty:dft) (Thomas, Drew)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, )
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kenworth Truck Company, a division of PACCAR Inc from DISTRICT COURT, ARAPAHOE COUNTY COLORADO, Case Number 2020-CV-032116. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7607112), filed by Kenworth Truck Company, a division of PACCAR Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Estes, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haedoug LLC v. Kenworth Truck Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haedoug LLC a/k/a Douglas Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haedoug LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Company, a division of PACCAR Inc
Represented By: David Herring Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Company
Represented By: David Herring Estes
Represented By: Drew M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?