PerfX Wireline Services, LLC v. DynaEnergetics US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PerfX Wireline Services, LLC
Defendant: DMC Global, Inc., DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH and DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03665
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Redmond, Megan)
March 5, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bader, Caroline)
March 5, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER/REPLY to #20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by PerfX Wireline Services, LLC.(Bader, Caroline)
February 12, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants DMC Global, Inc., DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bergman, Jonathon)
February 12, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant DMC Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bergman, Jonathon)
February 12, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bergman, Jonathon)
February 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Jonathon David Bergman on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Bergman, Jonathon)
February 12, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bergman, Jonathon)
February 12, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against PerfX Wireline Services, LLC by DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bergman, Jonathon)
February 8, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Redmond, Megan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5 February 2021. At the request of the parties, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for February 25, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for April 1, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 8-1) on or before March 12, 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/25/2021. (cmadr, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aditi K. Kulkarni-Knight on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Aditi K. Kulkarni-Knight added to party DMC Global, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aditi K. Kulkarni-Knight added to party DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH(pty:dft), Attorney Aditi K. Kulkarni-Knight added to party DynaEnergetics US, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kulkarni-Knight, Aditi)
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathon David Bergman on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jonathon David Bergman added to party DMC Global, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathon David Bergman added to party DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathon David Bergman added to party DynaEnergetics US, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bergman, Jonathon)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12 January 2021. For good cause shown, the "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint" #14 filed by Defendants DynaEnergetics US, Inc. and DMC Global Inc. is granted. These Defendants shall file an answer or other response to the operative complaint on or before February 12, 2021.(cmadr, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants DMC Global, Inc., DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Herman, Barry)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. DynaEnergetics US, Inc. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Redmond, Megan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. DMC Global, Inc. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Redmond, Megan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Caroline Ann Bader on behalf of PerfX Wireline Services, LLCAttorney Caroline Ann Bader added to party PerfX Wireline Services, LLC(pty:pla) (Bader, Caroline)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 15 December 2020. Consent Form due by 2/5/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DYNAENERGETICS EUROPE GMBH re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. (Redmond, Megan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DYNAENERGETICS US, INC., re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. (Redmond, Megan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DMC GLOBAL INC. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. (Redmond, Megan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Redmond, Megan)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Non-Infringement against DMC Global, Inc., DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7631589)Attorney Megan J. Redmond added to party PerfX Wireline Services, LLC(pty:pla), filed by PerfX Wireline Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Redmond, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PerfX Wireline Services, LLC v. DynaEnergetics US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMC Global, Inc.
Represented By: Aditi K. Kulkarni-Knight
Represented By: Barry J. Herman
Represented By: Jonathon David Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DynaEnergetics Europe GMBH
Represented By: Aditi K. Kulkarni-Knight
Represented By: Jonathon David Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Represented By: Aditi K. Kulkarni-Knight
Represented By: Barry J. Herman
Represented By: Jonathon David Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PerfX Wireline Services, LLC
Represented By: Megan J. Redmond
Represented By: Caroline Ann Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?