Laufer v. Super Kings Inc
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Defendant: Super Kings Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv03750
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Deborah Laufer as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) does not include the date service was complete, and the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) does not include a statement that no responsive pleading has been filed within the time limit set by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the court, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Super Kings, Inc by Plaintiff Deborah Laufer. (Cullen, Philip)
February 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Philip Michael Cullen, III on behalf of Deborah LauferAttorney Philip Michael Cullen, III added to party Deborah Laufer(pty:pla) (Cullen, Philip)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Laufer. Super Kings Inc served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Moore, Suzette)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/11/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/4/2021 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5-1] is February 25, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/23/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency by Plaintiff Deborah Laufer (Moore, Suzette)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Moore, Suzette)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Super Kings Inc (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7642626)Attorney Suzette Michele Moore added to party Deborah Laufer(pty:pla), filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Moore, Suzette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laufer v. Super Kings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Represented By: Suzette Michele Moore
Represented By: Philip Michael Cullen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Kings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?