Wilhelm v. Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Wilhelm
Defendant: Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., James C. Neary, Tomas Gorny, Jeffrey H. Fox, Joseph P. DiSabato, Dale Crandall, Andrea J. Ayers, Chandler J. Reedy, Justin L. Sadrian, Alexi A. Wellman and Peter J. Perrone
Case Number: 1:2020cv03779
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 2/1/2021. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Robert Wilhelm (Acocelli, Richard)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/28/2020. Consent Form due by 2/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/22/2021 (evaug )
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Richard Adam Acocelli on behalf of Robert Wilhelm (Acocelli, Richard)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrea J. Ayers, Dale Crandall, Joseph P. DiSabato, Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc., Jeffrey H. Fox, Tomas Gorny, James C. Neary, Peter J. Perrone, Chandler J. Reedy, Justin L. Sadrian, Alexi A. Wellman (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7644662)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party Robert Wilhelm(pty:pla), filed by Robert Wilhelm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilhelm v. Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance International Group Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Gorny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey H. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. DiSabato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea J. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler J. Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin L. Sadrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexi A. Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wilhelm
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?