Charter Communications, Inc. v. MarkMonitor, Inc.
Petitioner: Charter Communications, Inc.
Respondent: MarkMonitor, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020mc00119
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER. Entered by R. Brooke Jackson, United States District Judge, on September 1, 2020. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide Regina Rodriguez, Special Master in related case 19-cv-00874-RBJ-MEH, access to the restricted documents in this case. (apesa, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 Case Reassigned. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-mc-00119-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-mc-80084. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 Remark: Case transferred to District of Colorado (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #6 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #7 Motion to Transfer Case; granting #9 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot #1 Motion to Compel; granting #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
June 14, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Andrew Castricone in Support of #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMarkMonitor, Inc.. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Castricone, Andrew) (Filed on 6/14/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case ) Charter's Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer to the Issuing Court, filed byCharter Communications, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byMarkMonitor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Castricone)(Castricone, Andrew) (Filed on 6/5/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE AND REASSIGN CASES Re: 19-mc-80050-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/4/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY (re #1 MOTION to Compel ) filed byCharter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JENNIFER A. GOLINVEAUX, #2 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krishnan Padmanabhan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED - Reply ISO Motion to Compel, #4 UNREDACTED = Reply ISO Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), #6 Exhibit 1 (UNREDACTED))(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1 MOTION to Compel ) (re Subpoena Duces Tecum) filed byMarkMonitor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Castricone, #2 Declaration of Sam Bahun)(Castricone, Andrew) (Filed on 5/26/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. Responses due by 6/5/2020. Replies due by 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Golinveaux ISO Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krishnan Padmanabhan ISO Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admin Motion to Seal, #3 REDACTED VERSION of Charter's Motion to Transfer, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION of Charter's Motion to Transfer, #5 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 3 to Golinveaux Decl ISO Motion to Transfer, #6 UNREDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 3 to Golinveaux Decl ISO Motion to Transfer, #7 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 4 to Golinveaux Decl ISO Motion to Transfer, #8 UNREDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 4 to Golinveaux Decl ISO Motion to Transfer)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MarkMonitor, Inc. of Administrative Motion re Related Cases that was filed in Cox v. MarkMonitor, USDC Case No. 19-mc-80050 SK (Castricone, Andrew) (Filed on 5/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Notice (Other) Opposition to Notice of Related Cases by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Padmanabhan, Krishnan) (Filed on 5/19/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by MarkMonitor, Inc. of Related Cases (Cox Communications v. MarkMonitor and Bright House Networks v. MarkMonitor (Castricone, Andrew) (Filed on 5/18/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration Padmanabhan, #3 Declaration Chatterjee, #4 Declaration Golinveaux 001, #5 Declaration Golinveaux 002, #6 Declaration Golinveaux 003, #7 Declaration Golinveaux 004, #8 Declaration Golinveaux 005, #9 Declaration Golinveaux 006, #10 Declaration Golinveaux 007, #11 Declaration Golinveaux 008, #12 Declaration Golinveaux 009, #13 Declaration Golinveaux 010, #14 Declaration Golinveaux 011) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Charter Communications, Inc. Responses due by 5/26/2020. Replies due by 6/2/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2020: #1 Receipt) (wsnS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charter Communications, Inc. v. MarkMonitor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charter Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MarkMonitor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?