Merrifield v. 1859-Historic Hotels, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Merrifield
Defendant: 1859-Historic Hotels, Ltd. and John Doe doing business as Cliff House of Pikes Peak, The
Case Number: 1:2021cv00268
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Parties' failure to file a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form by the deadline set forth in this court's #6 Order, a Telephonic Status Conference is hereby SET for 3/26/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, to be vacated upon the filing of a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976# at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/25/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jocelyn Merrifield. 1859-Historic Hotels, Ltd. served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Liechty, Robert)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/18/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 3/24/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/31/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/7/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-268-NYW (angar, )
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and jury demand against 1859-Historic Hotels, Ltd (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7689069)Attorney Robert Mark Liechty added to party Jocelyn Merrifield(pty:pet), filed by Jocelyn Merrifield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Liechty, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrifield v. 1859-Historic Hotels, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1859-Historic Hotels, Ltd. and John Doe doing business as Cliff House of Pikes Peak, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Merrifield
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?