UcPech v. Chez Thuy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Pedro UcPech
Defendant: Thuy Le and Chez Thuy Corporation doing business as Chez Thuy Restaurant
Case Number: 1:2021cv00285
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #16 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/23/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting the Joint Motion for Leave to Appear at Scheduling Conference Telephonically [#17]. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, ALL COUNSEL OR PARTIES who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference set March 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE. Participating counsel or parties shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on March 23, 2021. Text Only Entry(klmlc1, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Pedro UcPech. (Dodson, Penn)
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear by Phone by Plaintiff Pedro UcPech. (Dodson, Penn)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Pedro UcPech All parties consent.. (Dodson, Penn)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Pedro UcPech All parties consent.. (Dodson, Penn)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen B. Rotter on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Stephen B. Rotter added to party Chez Thuy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen B. Rotter added to party Thuy Le(pty:dft) (Rotter, Stephen)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach on behalf of Chez Thuy Corporation, Thuy LeAttorney Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach added to party Chez Thuy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach added to party Thuy Le(pty:dft) (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pedro UcPech. Pedro UcPech waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Dodson, Penn)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pedro UcPech. Thuy Le waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Dodson, Penn)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/12/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/23/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/30/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chez Thuy Corporation by Plaintiff Pedro UcPech. (Dodson, Penn)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-285-KLM (angar, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Thuy Le, Chez Thuy Corporation re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Pedro UcPech. (Dodson, Penn)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chez Thuy Corporation, Thuy Le (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7692620)Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson added to party Pedro UcPech(pty:pla), filed by Pedro UcPech. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dodson, Penn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UcPech v. Chez Thuy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thuy Le
Represented By: Stephen B. Rotter
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chez Thuy Corporation doing business as Chez Thuy Restaurant
Represented By: Stephen B. Rotter
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro UcPech
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?