Seale v. QEP Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Seale
Defendant: QEP Resources, Inc., Michael J. Minarovic, Barth E. Whitham, Phillips S. Baker, Jr., Joseph N. Jaggers, Julie A. Dill, Timothy J. Cutt and Mary Shafer-Malicki
Case Number: 1:2021cv00303
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 10
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal #7 filed in this case on 17 March 20210. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Todd Seale (Sadeh, Daniel)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint and for Acceptance of Service by Defendants Joseph N. Jaggers, Timothy J. Cutt, Michael J. Minarovic, Barth E. Whitham, QEP Resources, Inc., Mary Shafer-Malicki, Phillips S. Baker, Jr., Julie A. Dill. All Defendants. (Gottschalk, Hugh)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Seale. QEP Resources, Inc. served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Sadeh, Daniel)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2 February 2021. Consent Form due by 3/25/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/1/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phillips S. Baker, Jr., Timothy J. Cutt, Julie A. Dill, Joseph N. Jaggers, Michael J. Minarovic, QEP Resources, Inc., Mary Shafer-Malicki, Barth E. Whitham (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7694691)Attorney Daniel Sadeh added to party Todd Seale(pty:pla), filed by Todd Seale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sadeh, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seale v. QEP Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QEP Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Minarovic
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barth E. Whitham
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips S. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N. Jaggers
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Dill
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Cutt
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Shafer-Malicki
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Seale
Represented By: Daniel Sadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?