Rajabi v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cyrus Rajabi
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Tristar Group doing business as Tristar Manged Care doing business as Tristar Risk Management and Tristar Group doing business as Tristar Managed Care doing business as Tristar Risk Management
Case Number: 1:2021cv00422
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sedgwick, L.P. for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Vaughn, Katherine)
March 17, 2021 Filing 23 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #22 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00422-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Cyrus Rajabi All parties do not consent.. (Smith, Scott)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Reset. For good cause, the forthcoming Scheduling Conference is VACATED. The parties shall confer and submit to the Court no less than three proposed dates and times for resetting the conference. (The Court is not available on April 6, 2021.) These proposals may be emailed to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/15/2021. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
March 12, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Reset SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND DUE-DATE FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Plaintiff Cyrus Rajabi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Smith, Scott)
February 25, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Richter, Jasmina)
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Richter, Jasmina)
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Tristar Group.(Richter, Jasmina)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, TRISTAR shall have up to and including February 25, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/19/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
February 18, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Victoria Brittany Hambley on behalf of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.Attorney Victoria Brittany Hambley added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hambley, Victoria)
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Tristar Group. (Proctor, Joshua)
February 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Robert Proctor on behalf of Tristar GroupAttorney Joshua Robert Proctor added to party Tristar Group(pty:dft) (Proctor, Joshua)
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jasmina Richter on behalf of Tristar GroupAttorney Jasmina Richter added to party Tristar Group(pty:dft) (Richter, Jasmina)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Vaughn, Katherine)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3/15/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #7 ) is due on or before 3/15/2021. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/18/21. Text Only Entry (amont, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott David Smith on behalf of Cyrus RajabiAttorney Scott David Smith added to party Cyrus Rajabi(pty:pla) (Smith, Scott)
February 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John G. Taussig, III on behalf of Cyrus RajabiAttorney John G. Taussig, III added to party Cyrus Rajabi(pty:pla) (Taussig, John)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. on 1/21/2021. (jtorr, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Tristar Group, filed by Cyrus Rajabi.(jtorr, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vaughn, Katherine)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30878. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7715051), filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Sedgwick SOS Summary, #5 Exhibit E - Tristar SOS Summary, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docket, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Notice of Filing of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaughn, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rajabi v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Vaughn
Represented By: Victoria Brittany Hambley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Group doing business as Tristar Manged Care doing business as Tristar Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Group doing business as Tristar Managed Care doing business as Tristar Risk Management
Represented By: Jasmina Richter
Represented By: Joshua Robert Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrus Rajabi
Represented By: Scott David Smith
Represented By: John G. Taussig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?