Crownhart v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Earl Crownhart
Defendant: Spectrum, Amsher Collection Services, Charter Communications and Nick Jackson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00451
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 RECORD ON APPEAL filed by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Earl Crownhart. Volume I - Pleadings; (USCA Case No. 21-1068). TEXT ONLY ENTRY (evana, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 21-1068 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Earl Crownhart. (sphil, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Earl Crownhart to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid and 1915 motion not filed,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record, #2 Docket Sheet)(sphil, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File a Pro se Action by Plaintiff Earl Crownhart. (sphil, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Clerk's Judgment, Order Reassigning Case, #4 Order Dismissing Case, by Plaintiff Earl Crownhart. (sphil, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 2/18/2021. (sphil, )
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Complaint and the action are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Plaintiff failed to comply with the sanction order restricting his ability to file pro se actions in this Court. ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/18/2021. (sphil, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Plaintiff Earl Crownhart. (jtorr, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amsher Collection Services, Charter Communications, Nick Jackson, Spectrum, filed by Earl Crownhart. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crownhart v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsher Collection Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Crownhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?