Tee Turtle, LLC v. Cukurova
Plaintiff: Tee Turtle, LLC
Defendant: Resit Gokce Cukurova
Case Number: 1:2021cv00546
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/8/2021. The parties Joint Stipulated Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction Order and Final Judgment. The Motion [filed March 4, 2021; ECF 7] is granted. (jgonz, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/8/2021. (cthom, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #8 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/05/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tee Turtle, LLC. Resit Gokce Cukurova served on 2/24/2021, answer due 3/17/2021. (Collard, Case)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Tee Turtle, LLC All parties consent.. (Collard, Case)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Permanent Injunction Order and Final Judgment by Plaintiff Tee Turtle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ramy Badie in Support of Permanent Injunction Order and Final Judgment, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Collard, Case)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frederick L. Ginsberg on behalf of Resit Gokce CukurovaAttorney Frederick L. Ginsberg added to party Resit Gokce Cukurova(pty:dft) (Ginsberg, Frederick)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 February 2021.Consent Form due by 5/14/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/20/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cpomm, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Willful and Intentional Copyright Infringement, Trade Dress Infringement, Unfair Competition, and Unfair or Deceptive Trade Practices against Resit Gokce Cukurova (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7732195)Attorney Case L. Collard added to party Tee Turtle, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Tee Turtle, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Collard, Case)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tee Turtle, LLC v. Cukurova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resit Gokce Cukurova
Represented By: Frederick L. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tee Turtle, LLC
Represented By: Case L. Collard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?