Schwab v. McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven R. Schwab
Defendant: Nicole C. Baber, McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc. and Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher
Case Number: 1:2021cv00615
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Nicole C. Baber, Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher, McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc.. (Guesno, Jacqueline)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that the parties confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. The proposed scheduling order should be prepared as described in the local rules. A copy of instructions for the preparation of a scheduling order and a form scheduling order can be downloaded from the Courts website www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/27/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00615-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Steven R. Schwab All parties do not consent.. (Kramer, Gary)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 Exhibits in Support of #12 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Steven R. Schwab. (Kramer, Gary)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Steven R. Schwab. (Kramer, Gary)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and Request for Initial Case Deadlines to Be Held in Abeyance. The deadlines in the #4 Order Setting Initial Case Deadlines, EXCEPT for the deadline for the parties to file their consent form, are held in abeyance pending ruling on the #9 MOTION to Stay. If the Motion to Stay is denied, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than fourteen days after the ruling. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/14/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, and Request for Initial Case Deadlines To Be Held in Abeyance by Defendants Nicole C. Baber, Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher, McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Guesno, Jacqueline)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Nicole C. Baber, Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher, McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Guesno, Jacqueline)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc., Nicole C. Baber, Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher. All Defendants. (Guesno, Jacqueline)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven R. Schwab. Nicole C. Baber served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Kramer, Gary)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven R. Schwab. Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Kramer, Gary)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven R. Schwab. McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc. served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Kramer, Gary)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/03/2021. Consent Form due by 4/28/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/28/2021 (evaug )
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicole C. Baber, Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher, McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7742629)Attorney Gary M. Kramer added to party Steven R. Schwab(pty:pla), filed by Steven R. Schwab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons McKinney, #3 Summons Kaltenbacher, #4 Summons Baber)(Kramer, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwab v. McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Schwab
Represented By: Gary M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole C. Baber
Represented By: Jacqueline Raquel Guesno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinney Door and Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline Raquel Guesno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristofer E. Kaltenbacher
Represented By: Jacqueline Raquel Guesno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?