Lundstrom v. Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Megan Lundstrom
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00619
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1589
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/16/2021. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. #13 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion to dismiss on or before May 14, 2021. For future requests for extension of time, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to this Court's Practice Standards, "[m]otions for extension of time require a showing of good cause, which must be established with particularity." Practice Standards (Civil Cases), Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer I.G.1. Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Megan Lundstrom. (Clifton, Douglas)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (DeWick, Amanda)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/09/2021 re: #10 Choice Hotels International, Inc.' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is STRICKEN for failure to comply with III.A of this Court's Practice Standards ("All motions... shall not exceed fifteen pages... These page limitations include... [the] signature block, and all other matters, except the certificate of service."). Defendant may file a complying motion. Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. (DeWick, Amanda) Modified on 4/9/2021 (pabsec2, ).
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sara M. Turner by Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Turner, Sara)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion. According, Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. has up to and including 4/8/2021 to Answer or otherwise respond. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3-24-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(DeWick, Amanda)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megan Lundstrom. Choice Hotels International, Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Clifton, Douglas)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/03/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7744321)Attorney Douglas H. Clifton added to party Megan Lundstrom(pty:pla), filed by Megan Lundstrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Clifton, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundstrom v. Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Lundstrom
Represented By: Douglas H. Clifton
Represented By: Chelsea Russell Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda W. DeWick
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?