Connally v. Blue Star Recyclers
Plaintiff: Killian Connally
Defendant: Blue Star Recyclers
Case Number: 1:2021cv00685
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1612
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 21 April 2021. This Amended Minute Order amends and supersedes the Minute Order found at Dkt. #8 . It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending EEOC Mediation (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED IN PART as follows. Rather than enter a stay of proceedings, the Court will VACATE the Scheduling Conference set for May 27, 2021 at 9:30 a.m., and RESET it to July 1, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the consent deadline is extended up to and including June 17, 2021. The proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before June 24, 2021. It is further ORDERED Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) is extended up to and including May 24, 2021. The parties are otherwise relieved on any discovery obligations prior to their May 11, 2021 EEOC mediation. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 21 April 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending EEOC Mediation (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED IN PART as follows. Rather than enter a stay of proceedings, the Court will VACATE the Scheduling Conference set for May 27, 2021 at 9:30 a.m., and RESET it to July 1, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the consent deadline is extended up to and including June 17, 2021. The proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before June 24, 2021. The parties are otherwise relieved on any discovery obligations prior to their May 11, 2021 EEOC mediation. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending EEOC Mediation by Defendant Blue Star Recyclers. (Bartkus, Courtney)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Blue Star Recyclers. Blue Star Recyclers answer due 4/22/2021. (Wells, Martine)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Killian Connally. Blue Star Recyclers served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Kramer, Gary)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/8/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 5/13/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/20/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/27/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (nmarb, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Star Recyclers (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7751172)Attorney Gary M. Kramer added to party Killian Connally(pty:pla), filed by Killian Connally. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kramer, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connally v. Blue Star Recyclers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Star Recyclers
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Bartkus
Represented By: Martine Tariot Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Killian Connally
Represented By: Gary M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?