Singh v. Wilkinson et al
Petitioner: Billa Singh
Respondent: Jeffery D. Lynch, Monty Wilkinson and Johnny Choate
Case Number: 1:2021cv00715
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #6 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Jeffery D. Lynch (pty:res), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Monty Wilkinson(pty:res) by Johnny Choate, Jeffery D. Lynch, Monty Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Sarah Garcia)(Jafek, Timothy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 RECEIPT for Certified mail Green Card re: #10 Certificate of Service, upon the United States Attorney, Washington DC (evana, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 RECEIPT for Return Green Card for Certified Mail re: #10 Certificate of Service, as to Jeffery D. Lynch (rvill, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 RECEIPT for Retrun Green Card for Certified Mail re: #10 Certificate of Service, as to Johnny Choate (evana, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 RECEIPT for Return Green Card for certified Mail re: #10 Certificate of Service, for Monty Wilkinson (evana, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #6 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #8 Order to Show Cause for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt Choate, #2 USPS Certified Mail Receipt Lynch, #3 USPS Certified Mail Receipt USAG, #4 USPS Certified Mail Receipt Wilkinson) (jsalz, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b), the court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00715-CMA. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 6, 2021. (rvill, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is ORDERED that Respondent show cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the application for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. Within thirty (30) days of Respondents answer to this show cause order Applicant may file a Reply, if any. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 6, 2021. (rvill, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/5/2021. Applicant's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED as moot because Applicant has paid the filing fee. (agarc, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Billa Singh.(angar, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Billa Singh in the amount of $ 5.00; Receipt Number COX098615 (angar, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiencies. If Petitioner fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on March 10, 2021. (Forms mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Informa Pauperis. by Petitioner Billy Singh. (cpomm, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Billy Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Wilkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffery D. Lynch
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Monty Wilkinson
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billa Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?