Price v. Blice
Plaintiff: Kionna Price
Defendant: Ryan A. Blice
Case Number: 1:2021cv00819
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re: #17 Notice of Settlement filed by Ryan A. Blice. In light of the notice of settlement, the Court requests that the parties file a Dismissal Paper by 6/11/2021. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/11/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Ryan A. Blice (Wheeler, Karen)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The Court orders defendant to show cause within 14 days as to why this case should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff alleged that both parties were residents and citizens of Colorado. Moreover, even according to the defendant's affidavit, on the date of the accident, December 2020, the defendant was residing and working in Colorado and had been since January 2019. It is not indicated where he paid state income taxes. He states that he will "likely" return to Texas later this year. It does appear to the Court that there is a good basis to claim Texas citizenship, and if not, the Court would appreciate a stipulation to a remand without further litigation on the subject. The Court also notes that, although plaintiff checked the $100,000 box in her civil cover sheet, her medical expenses are said to be approximately $15,000, and she is not making a wage loss claim. This appears to be a case that should proceed in state court. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/26/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Ryan A. Blice. (Wheeler, Karen)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 4/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 4/14/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/12/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #12 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00819-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 April 2021. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #11 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Ryan A. Blice All parties do not consent.. (Deaver, Nicholas)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET by Defendant Ryan A. Blice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Deaver, Nicholas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Ryan A. Blice.(Wheeler, Karen)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 March 2021. Consent Form due by 4/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/14/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Eric Bennett on behalf of Kionna PriceAttorney Matthew Eric Bennett added to party Kionna Price(pty:pla) (Bennett, Matthew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Ryan A. Blice on 02/26/2021. (jsalz, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Ryan A. Blice, filed by Kionna Price.(jsalz, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryan A. Blice from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30664. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7773589), filed by Ryan A. Blice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Wheeler, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Blice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan A. Blice
Represented By: Karen Hannah Wheeler
Represented By: Nicholas James Deaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kionna Price
Represented By: Matthew Eric Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?