Maestas v. American Furniture Warehouse Co.
Plaintiff: Ashley Maestas
Defendant: American Furniture Warehouse Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00850
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Maestas. American Furniture Warehouse Co. served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (Quisenberry, Andrew)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 Minute ORDER Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 19 May 2021. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Reset Scheduling Cnference and Extend the Deadline to File Consent/Non-Consent Form, Dkt. #7 , is GRANTED, finding good cause shown. The Scheduling Conference set on June 9, 2021 is VACATED and RESET to July 22, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The deadline for filing the Consent/Nonconsent Form, Dkt. #3-1 is extended to July 8, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Deadline to File Consent/Non-Consent Form by Plaintiff Ashley Maestas. (Quisenberry, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Furniture Warehouse Co., filed by Ashley Maestas.(Quisenberry, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ashley Maestas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint)(Quisenberry, Andrew)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 24 March 2021. Consent Form due by 5/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/2/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Ashley Maestas against American Furniture Warehouse Co. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7779294)Attorney Andrew Curry Quisenberry added to party Ashley Maestas (pty:pla), filed by Ashley Maestas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Quisenberry, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maestas v. American Furniture Warehouse Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Furniture Warehouse Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Maestas
Represented By: Andrew Curry Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?