Galindo v. Daisy Lane Dairy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aurelio Galindo
Defendant: Daisy Lane Dairy Inc. and Dennis Willbert Koolstra
Case Number: 1:2021cv00904
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONSES Returned Executed Daisy Lane Dairy Inc. served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021; Dennis Willbert Koolstra served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(cmadr, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #10 to Aurelio Galindo Privada 5 de Febrero #607 San Lorenzo Teotipilco Tehuancan, PU 75855 Mexico. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10 May 2021. Consent Form due by 6/24/2021. Status Conference set for 7/8/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Status Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #6 Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 Form USM-285 for Daisy Lane Dairy Inc. #2 Form USM-285 for Dennis Willbert Koolstra) (rvill, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00904-NRN. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on May 10, 2021. (rvill, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Daisy Lane Dairy Inc., Dennis Willbert Koolstra, filed by Aurelio Galindo.(rvill, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to File Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint within the time allowed, the Court may dismiss this action without further notice. However, Plaintiff is warned that, even if this case is dismissed without prejudice, the dismissal may act as a dismissal with prejudice if the time for filing expires. See Rodriguez v. Colorado, 521 F. App'x 670, 671-72 (10th Cir. 2013). Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 2000e-5(f)(1), a claimant has ninety days to file a civil action after receiving a notice of right to sue from the EEOC. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 1, 2021. (rvill, )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on March 30, 2021.(rvill, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Aurelio Galindo. (cpomm, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Daisy Lane Dairy Inc., Dennis Willbert Koolstra, filed by Aurelio Galindo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Service Documents)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galindo v. Daisy Lane Dairy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Lane Dairy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Willbert Koolstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?