Elide Fire USA, LLC v. Auto Fire Guard, LLC
Plaintiff: Elide Fire USA, LLC
Defendant: Auto Fire Guard, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00943
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elide Fire USA, LLC. Auto Fire Guard, LLC served on 4/24/2021, answer due 5/15/2021. (Adli, Dariush)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/12/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. A proposed Protective Order is due by 6/11/21. Consent Form due by 6/4/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/11/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Elide Fire USA, LLC. (Adli, Dariush)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Auto Fire Guard, LLC re #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Elide Fire USA, LLC. (Adli, Dariush)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Auto Fire Guard, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7800164)Attorney Dariush G. Adli added to party Elide Fire USA, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Elide Fire USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Adli, Dariush)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elide Fire USA, LLC v. Auto Fire Guard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elide Fire USA, LLC
Represented By: Dariush G. Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Fire Guard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?