Baum v. Dunmire Property Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammy L Baum
Defendant: Dunmire Property Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00964
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/3/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00964-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Dunmire Property Management, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Powers, Alice)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Proposed Scheduling Order. The deadline to file a proposed scheduling order is extended to August 2, 2021. The consent form deadline remains as set. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/02/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Alice Conway Powers by Alice Conway Powers on behalf of Dunmire Property Management, Inc. (Powers, Alice)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Dunmire Property Management, Inc.. (Powers, Alice)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Eugene Givens on behalf of Tammy L Baum (Givens, Gregory)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Gregory Eugene Givens was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Counsel, however, need not pay any delinquent biennial fees. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tammy L Baum. Dunmire Property Management, Inc. waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Givens, Gregory)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Dunmire Property Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Tammy L Baum. (Givens, Gregory)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 6/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/2/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/06/2021. (evaug )
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (alave, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Dunmire Property Management, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7799456)Attorney Gregory Eugene Givens added to party Tammy L Baum(pty:pla), filed by Tammy L Baum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Givens, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baum v. Dunmire Property Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunmire Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Conway Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy L Baum
Represented By: Gregory Eugene Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?