Nhu-Nguyen Duong v. Colorado Seminary, The et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Nhu-Nguyen Duong
Defendant: Martin Katz, Greg Kvistad, Paul Chan, University of Denver Sturm College of Law, University of Denver, Colorado Seminary, The, Sturm College of Law and Greg Kvidtad
Case Number: 1:2021cv01002
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Colorado Seminary, The, University of Denver. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/3/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Colorado Seminary, The, University of Denver.(Goh, Jimmy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 18 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Colorado Seminary, The, University of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(e))(Goh, Jimmy)
May 13, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, to Wendy Nhu-Nguyen Duong, 3426 East Cedar Hollow Drive, Pearland, TX 77584. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. The deadline for Defendant the University of Denver and its Academic Unit Sturm College of Law to respond to #12 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is extended until 6/1/2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/12/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
May 12, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Colorado Seminary, The, University of Denver. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/12/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint by Defendants Colorado Seminary, The, University of Denver. (Mangum, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Colorado Seminary answer and University of Denver served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(angar, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 6/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on April 14, 2021. (rvill, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/ 14/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/14/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01002-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/21. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall assign another judge to this case. (nmarb, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Colorado Seminary, The, University of Denver, filed by Wendy Nhu-Nguyen Duong.(nmarb, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Colorado Seminary, The, Sturm College of Law, filed by Wendy Nhu-Nguyen Duong.(nmarb, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jtorr, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST by Plaintiff Wendy Nhu-Nguyen Duong. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jtorr, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (alave, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Greg Kvistad, Martin Katz, Paul Chan, University of Denver Sturm College of Law Filing Fee: 402.00Receipt Number:COX098691, filed by Wendy Nhu-Nguyen Duong.(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nhu-Nguyen Duong v. Colorado Seminary, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kvistad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Denver Sturm College of Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Denver
Represented By: Jimmy Goh
Represented By: Erin Rayner Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Seminary, The
Represented By: Jimmy Goh
Represented By: Erin Rayner Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturm College of Law
Represented By: Jimmy Goh
Represented By: Erin Rayner Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kvidtad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Nhu-Nguyen Duong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?