Carter v. Ethicon Endo Surgery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Carter
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC and Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01109
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.. (Casolaro, Christopher)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Casolaro, Christopher)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. (Casolaro, Christopher)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC. (Casolaro, Christopher)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc..(Casolaro, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. All Defendants. (Casolaro, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather C. Perkins on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C. Perkins added to party Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Perkins, Heather)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Casolaro on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Christopher J. Casolaro added to party Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Casolaro added to party Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Casolaro added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Casolaro added to party Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Casolaro, Christopher)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 7/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/7/2021.By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/11/2021. (evaug )
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Based on the #6 Response to Order to Show Cause, the 4 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/11/21. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 4 by Plaintiff Carrie Carter. (Stott, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. Attorney Matthew Giovanni Stott added to party Carrie Carter(pty:pla), filed by Carrie Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Stipulation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Stipulation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Registry of Business and Entities, Puerto Rico)(Stott, Matthew)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon consideration of the Complaint alleging diversity jurisdiction, which requires complete diversity of citizenship between the parties. Here, Plaintiff alleges that she is a resident of the State of Colorado. Plaintiff also alleges Defendant Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, was and is a foreign corporation with its principal place of business in Puerto Rico. However, an LLC, as an unincorporated association, takes the citizenship of all its members. Siloam Springs Hotel, L.L.C. v. Century Sur. Co., 781 F.3d 1233, 1234 (10th Cir. 2015) (citations omitted). Accordingly, Plaintiff's allegations are insufficient, as the identity and citizenship of the LLC's members have not been shown. The court is therefore unable to determine that complete diversity of citizenship exists. It is ORDERED that on or before May 7, 2021, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed due to this Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/23/21. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrie Carter (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7830777)Attorney Peter A. Ricciardelli added to party Carrie Carter(pty:pla), filed by Carrie Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Ethicon Inc, #3 Summons Summons - Ethicon LLC, #4 Summons Summons - J&J Consumer, #5 Summons Summons - J&J Health Care)(Ricciardelli, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Ethicon Endo Surgery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc
Represented By: Heather C. Perkins
Represented By: Christopher J. Casolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Heather C. Perkins
Represented By: Christopher J. Casolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC
Represented By: Heather C. Perkins
Represented By: Christopher J. Casolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc
Represented By: Heather C. Perkins
Represented By: Christopher J. Casolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Carter
Represented By: Peter A. Ricciardelli
Represented By: Ben C. Martin
Represented By: Matthew Giovanni Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?