Innovative Timing Systems, LLC v. RaceRite, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Timing Systems, LLC
Defendant: Race Result Americas Inc. and RaceRite, LLC doing business as Race Result USA
Counter Claimant: RaceRite, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01115
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Claim for Patent Infringement against Innovative Timing Systems, LLC by Race Result Americas Inc., RaceRite, LLC.(Thomas, Jonathan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Michael Dubner by Michael William Dubner on behalf of Race Result Americas Inc., RaceRite, LLCAttorney Michael William Dubner added to party Race Result Americas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael William Dubner added to party RaceRite, LLC(pty:dft) (Dubner, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Terrell Miller by Terrell Richard Miller on behalf of Race Result Americas Inc., RaceRite, LLCAttorney Terrell Richard Miller added to party Race Result Americas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Terrell Richard Miller added to party RaceRite, LLC(pty:dft) (Miller, Terrell)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of J. Michael Thomas by Jonathan Michael Thomas on behalf of Race Result Americas Inc., RaceRite, LLCAttorney Jonathan Michael Thomas added to party Race Result Americas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Michael Thomas added to party RaceRite, LLC(pty:dft) (Thomas, Jonathan)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Race Result Americas Inc., RaceRite, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Bates, David)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of David Bates by David Matthew Bates on behalf of Race Result Americas Inc., RaceRite, LLCAttorney David Matthew Bates added to party Race Result Americas Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Matthew Bates added to party RaceRite, LLC(pty:dft) (Bates, David)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Timing Systems, LLC. Race Result Americas Inc. served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021; RaceRite, LLC served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (McAndrews, Matthew)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/6/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/8/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/15/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle David Wallenberg on behalf of Innovative Timing Systems, LLCAttorney Kyle David Wallenberg added to party Innovative Timing Systems, LLC(pty:pla) (Wallenberg, Kyle)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7831841)Attorney Matthew George McAndrews added to party Innovative Timing Systems, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Innovative Timing Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 9,076,053, #2 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 9,286,563, #3 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 10,095,973, #4 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 10,311,354, #5 Exhibit U.S. Pat. No. 10,445,637, #6 Summons RaceResult Summons, #7 Summons RaceRite Summons, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(McAndrews, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Timing Systems, LLC v. RaceRite, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Race Result Americas Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Thomas
Represented By: David Matthew Bates
Represented By: Michael William Dubner
Represented By: Terrell Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RaceRite, LLC doing business as Race Result USA
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Thomas
Represented By: David Matthew Bates
Represented By: Michael William Dubner
Represented By: Terrell Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Timing Systems, LLC
Represented By: Kyle David Wallenberg
Represented By: Matthew George McAndrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: RaceRite, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Thomas
Represented By: David Matthew Bates
Represented By: Michael William Dubner
Represented By: Terrell Richard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?