Betts v. Smith
Plaintiff: Terry Betts
Defendant: Paul (I) Cline, Dean (I) Williams, Justin Smith, Justin (I) Smith, Dean Williams and Paul Cline
Case Number: 1:2021cv01136
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against Justin Smith, filed by Terry Betts. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (athom, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this order, one blank copy of the Prisoner Complaint form, along with the applicable instructions. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff's Request to Amend Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) (ECF No. #6 ) is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 05/18/2021. (athom, ) (form and instructions mailed as ordered)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Request to Amend Fed.R.Civ.P 15(a) by Plaintiff Terry Betts. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (athom, )
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Terry Betts in the amount of $ 1.93; Receipt Number COX098977; Initial PLRA Payment. (athom, )
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 04/26/2021.(athom, ) (emailed as ordered)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Terry Betts. (cpomm, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Paul Cline, Paul (I) Cline, Justin Smith, Justin (I) Smith, Dean Williams, Dean (I) Williams, filed by Terry Betts. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Proposed Summons)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul (I) Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean (I) Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin (I) Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?