Scull v. Sling TV LLC
Plaintiff: Adam Scull
Defendant: Sling TV LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01192
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 June 2021. is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines (Dkt. #10 ) is GRANTED for good cause shown. Accordingly, the deadlines in this matterare extended thirty (30) days. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2021, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or, if no settlement has been reached, a joint status report. It is further ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for July 19, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. If no settlement has been reached on or before July 19, 2021, the parties shall jointly contact chambers (303-335-2403) to reset the Scheduling Conference. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Case Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Sling TV LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/15/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Case Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Defendant Sling TV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Saffer, Ian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Sling TV LLC. Sling TV LLC answer due 6/23/2021. (Saffer, Ian)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Scull. Sling TV LLC served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Freeman, James)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 30 April 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/29/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/30/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jsalz, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Honorable Jesse M. Furman's Opinions and Orders by Plaintiff Adam Scull (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Freeman, James)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sling TV L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7845475)Attorney James Harris Freeman added to party Adam Scull(pty:pla), filed by Adam Scull. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Photograph, #2 Exhibit B: Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit C: Official Deposit Copy, #4 Exhibit D: Screenshots of Infringement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Proposed Summons, #7 Exhibit Copyright AO 121 Form)(Freeman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scull v. Sling TV LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Scull
Represented By: James Harris Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sling TV LLC
Represented By: Ian Lawrence Saffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?