Millennium Funding, Inc. et al v. Sharktech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Millennium Funding, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC., Eve Nevada, LLC, HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. and Outpost Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Tim Mouhieddine Timrawi and Sharktech, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01261
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rodrigues, Airina)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrea M. LaFrance on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Andrea M. LaFrance added to party Sharktech, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea M. LaFrance added to party Tim Mouhieddine Timrawi(pty:dft) (LaFrance, Andrea)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Airina Lynn Rodrigues on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Airina Lynn Rodrigues added to party Sharktech, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Airina Lynn Rodrigues added to party Tim Mouhieddine Timrawi(pty:dft) (Rodrigues, Airina)
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua J. Lee on behalf of Eve Nevada, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC.Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla) (Lee, Joshua)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 7-29-2021 at 10:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7-22-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#4] is due 7-22-2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6-11-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Voltage Holdings, LLC., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC. All Defendants. (Culpepper, Kerry)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SHARKTECH, INC. and TIM MOUHIEDDINE TIMRAWI by Plaintiffs Eve Nevada, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Culpepper, Kerry)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01261-SKC. (Text Only Entry). (rkeec)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE entered by Judge Marcia S. Krieger. (rkeec)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly. Case reassigned directly to Senior Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01261-MSK. (Text only entry.) (jtorr, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, ) Modified to correct PDF on 5/10/2021 (jtorr, ).
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Each summons caption must list all parties. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Holdings, LLC. for Eve Nevada, LLC; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for Outpost Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for contributory infringement, vicarious infringement and DMCA violations against Sharktech, Inc., Tim Mouhieddine Timrawi (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7857314)Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), filed by Voltage Holdings, LLC., HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Affidavit of Daniel Arheidt, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millennium Funding, Inc. et al v. Sharktech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltage Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outpost Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Mouhieddine Timrawi
Represented By: Airina Lynn Rodrigues
Represented By: Andrea M. LaFrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharktech, Inc.
Represented By: Airina Lynn Rodrigues
Represented By: Andrea M. LaFrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?