Deese v. City and County of Denver et al
Petitioner: Brian David Deese
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and City and County of Denver
Case Number: 1:2021cv01316
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #7 Order Dismissing Case, #8 Clerk's Judgment, Order Reassigning Case Addressed to Brian David Deese. (athom, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #7 Order of Dismissal on 06/23/2021. (athom, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED WIHTOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the failure of Brian David Deese to prosecute and to file a notice of address change as required by the Local Rules of this Court. No certificate of appealability will issue. IFP on appeal is denied. Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 06/23/2021. (athom, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Order, Addressed to Brian David Deese. (athom, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 3 Case Assigned to Judge, #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 Addressed to Brian David Deese. (athom, )
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCY. If Mr. Deese fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 05/14/2021. (athom, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Brian David Deese. (jtorr, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Brian David Deese. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deese v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian David Deese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?