Boulter et al v. Noble Energy, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Nix Produce, Inc., Mike Boulter, Barclay Farms, LLC, Boulter LLC, Boulter, LLC and Ralph Nix Produce, Inc
Defendant: Noble Energy Inc, Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP, Noble Energy, Inc and Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv01346
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 32 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Barclay Farms, LLC, Mike Boulter, Boulter, LLC, Ralph Nix Produce, Inc. (Burrows, Stacy)
July 14, 2021 Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Joinder to Defendant Noble Energy Inc.'s 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT KERR-MCGEE OIL & GAS ONSHORE, L.P.S FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Barclay Farms, LLC, Mike Boulter, Boulter, LLC, Ralph Nix Produce, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Barton, George)
July 14, 2021 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder to Defendant Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NOBLE ENERGY INC.S FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Barclay Farms, LLC, Mike Boulter, Boulter, LLC, Ralph Nix Produce, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Barton, George)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder to Defendant Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) filed by Noble Energy, Inc, #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Joinder to Defendant Noble Energy Inc.'s 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/9/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/9/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/9/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 8, 2021 Filing 26 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #25 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01346-RM-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/8/2021. ORDERED that the clerk's office shall reassign this case by random draw. (sphil, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 24 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01346-PAB. (Text Only Entry). (alave, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE re #17 Order, JOINT NOTICE THAT ALL PARTIES DO NOT CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiffs Barclay Farms, LLC, Mike Boulter, Boulter, LLC, Ralph Nix Produce, Inc (Burrows, Stacy)
June 30, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Joinder to Defendant Noble Energy Inc.'s 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Williams, Ezekiel)
June 30, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Joinder to Defendant Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) by Defendant Noble Energy, Inc. (Stevenson, Shannon)
June 29, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Nicole Smith on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LPAttorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft) (Smith, Shannon)
June 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony N. Kaim on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LPAttorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft) (Kaim, Anthony)
June 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Barrett H. Reasoner on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LPAttorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft) (Reasoner, Barrett)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/25/21, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent. Consent Form due by 7/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/15/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/22/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP. (Williams, Ezekiel)
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Corporate Parent Anadarko Petroleum Corporation for Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP. (Williams, Ezekiel)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Spencer R Allen on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LPAttorney Spencer R Allen added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft) (Allen, Spencer)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carlos R. Romo on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LPAttorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft) (Romo, Carlos)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ezekiel J. Williams on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LPAttorney Ezekiel J. Williams added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft) (Williams, Ezekiel)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rauchway, Jonathan)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gabrielle Lyn Robbie on behalf of Noble Energy, IncAttorney Gabrielle Lyn Robbie added to party Noble Energy, Inc(pty:dft) (Robbie, Gabrielle)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Robert Henderson on behalf of Noble Energy, IncAttorney James Robert Henderson added to party Noble Energy, Inc(pty:dft) (Henderson, James)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Wells Stevenson on behalf of Noble Energy, IncAttorney Shannon Wells Stevenson added to party Noble Energy, Inc(pty:dft) (Stevenson, Shannon)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan William Rauchway on behalf of Noble Energy, IncAttorney Jonathan William Rauchway added to party Noble Energy, Inc(pty:dft) (Rauchway, Jonathan)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noble Energy, Inc served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Barton, George)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Barton, George)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney George A. Barton. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7872183)Attorney George A. Barton added to party Barclay Farms, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney George A. Barton added to party Mike Boulter(pty:pla), Attorney George A. Barton added to party Boulter LLC(pty:pla), filed by Mike Boulter, Barclay Farms, LLC, Boulter LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons)(Barton, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boulter et al v. Noble Energy, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Nix Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Boulter
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Stacy Ann Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barclay Farms, LLC
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Stacy Ann Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boulter LLC
Represented By: George A. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boulter, LLC
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Stacy Ann Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Nix Produce, Inc
Represented By: George A. Barton
Represented By: Stacy Ann Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Energy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Energy, Inc
Represented By: Gabrielle Lyn Robbie
Represented By: James Robert Henderson
Represented By: Jonathan William Rauchway
Represented By: Shannon Wells Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Spencer R Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?