Seeley International PTY LTD v. Maisotsenko et al
Plaintiff: SEELEY INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD
Defendant: M-CYCLE CORPORATION, LTD., VALERIY MAISOTSENKO, M-CYCLE INDUSTRIES, INC., M-Cycle Industries, Inc and M-Cycle Corporation, LTD
Case Number: 1:2021cv01350
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Granting #30 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's deadline to file a Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended until thirty (30) days after Plaintiff files its Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/8/2021. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Seeley International PTY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dunne, William)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 7/20/2021 within which to file its Response to #22 Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/6/2021. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendants M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy Maisotsenko. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Appendix Unpublished decision cited in Memo)(Knull, Charles)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 First MOTION for More Definite Statement and to Dismiss for Failure to Add a Party by Plaintiff Seeley International PTY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dunne, William)
June 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 BRIEF in Opposition to #20 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Defendants M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy Maisotsenko. (Knull, Charles)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Defendants represented to the Court that this case is subject to arbitration (Doc. # 17). To date, however, the parties have not stipulated to arbitration, and Defendants have not moved to compel arbitration. The Court therefore ORDERS the parties to confer and, if they agree to arbitration, file a stipulation to that effect within 14 days of the date of this Order. If the parties are not able to agree to arbitration, and Defendant seeks to compel arbitration, it shall file a motion to compel arbitration within 14 days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/17/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Knull, Charles)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Knull, Charles)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 First MOTION for More Definite Statement and to Dismiss for Failure to Add a Party by Defendants M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy Maisotsenko. (Knull, Charles)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Defendants shall file a Response to #20 Plaintiff's Motion to Restrict on or before 6/24/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/10/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Seeley International PTY LTD. (Schutte, Kevin)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and VACATES theTRO Motion Hearing set for June 9, 2021 at 9:00 AM., by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/8/2021.(evana, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy Maisotsenko. (Public Entry for RESTRICTED #17 Document, filed 6/3/2021) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (evana, )
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendants M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy Maisotsenko.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stan May Declaration, #2 Exhibit Stan May Exh A, #3 Exhibit Stan May Exh B, #4 Exhibit Stan May Exh C, #5 Affidavit Maisotsenko Declaration, #6 Exhibit Maisotsenko Exh A, #7 Exhibit Maisotsenko Exh B)(Knull, Charles)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's Calendar, the TRO Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 is VACATED and RESET to 6/9/2021, at 9:00 AM before Judge Christine M. Arguello. This hearing will be conducted via VTC. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/27/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 LETTER to court regarding Plaintiff's request for TRO hearing scheduling by Defendants M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy Maisotsenko. The LETTER is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a) ("A request for a court order must be made by motion") and 7(b) ("The rules governing captions and other matters of form in pleadings apply to motions and other papers."). Defendants are ORDERED to file a response to 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in a form that complies with the rules of procedure on or before 6/3/2021FURTHER ORDERED that a TRO Motion Hearing is set for 6/10/2021, 09:00 AM before Judge Christine M. Arguello. In an effort to slow the spread of COVID-19, to promote public health and safety, and to minimize the risk of exposure to the virus for all parties, this Hearing will be conducted via VTC. Counsel are directed to contact my Courtroom Deputy via email (Socorro_West@cod.uscourts.gov) for instructions on how to proceed with VTC. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/27/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STRICKEN LETTER to court regarding Plaintiff's request for TRO hearing scheduling by Defendants M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy Maisotsenko. (Knull, Charles) (Modified on 5/30/2021 STRICKEN Pursuant to the 15 Order)(evana, ).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Seeley International PTY LTD. Public Entry for ECF No. #11 . Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles H. Knull on behalf of M-Cycle Corporation, LTD, M-Cycle Industries, Inc, Valeriy MaisotsenkoAttorney Charles H. Knull added to party M-Cycle Corporation, LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Charles H. Knull added to party M-Cycle Industries, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Charles H. Knull added to party Valeriy Maisotsenko(pty:dft) (Knull, Charles)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Seeley International PTY LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL, #5 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order, #11 Exhibit A - to Order, #12 Exhibit B - to Order)(Schutte, Kevin)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William P. Dunne, III on behalf of Seeley International PTY LTDAttorney William P. Dunne, III added to party Seeley International PTY LTD(pty:pla) (Dunne, William)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Thomas Schutte on behalf of Seeley International PTY LTD (Schutte, Kevin)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Duncan Eugene Barber on behalf of Seeley International PTY LTDAttorney Duncan Eugene Barber added to party Seeley International PTY LTD(pty:pla) (Barber, Duncan)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/18/21, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/1/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/8/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/18/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Seeley International PTY LTD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent List)(Schutte, Kevin)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M-CYCLE CORPORATION, LTD., M-CYCLE INDUSTRIES, INC., VALERIY MAISOTSENKO (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7872440)Attorney Kevin Thomas Schutte added to party SEELEY INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD(pty:pla), filed by SEELEY INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Maisotsenko, #3 Summons M-Cycle Industries, #4 Summons M-Cycle Corp)(Schutte, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seeley International PTY LTD v. Maisotsenko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-CYCLE CORPORATION, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERIY MAISOTSENKO
Represented By: Charles H. Knull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-CYCLE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-Cycle Industries, Inc
Represented By: Charles H. Knull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-Cycle Corporation, LTD
Represented By: Charles H. Knull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEELEY INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Schutte
Represented By: Duncan Eugene Barber
Represented By: William P. Dunne, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?