IHF, LLC v. OBN Logistics, Inc
Plaintiff: IHF, LLC
Defendant: OBN Logistics, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01357
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 8/31/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/31/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/13/2021. (evaug )
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order. The deadline will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/13/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to submit proposed scheduling order by Plaintiff IHF, LLC. (Neusch, Erik)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IHF, LLC. OBN Logistics, Inc served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Neusch, Erik)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES Consent Form due by 7/14/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/14/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/19/2021. (evaug )
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet Attachment by Plaintiff IHF, LLC (Neusch, Erik)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to OBN Logistics, Inc. re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff IHF, LLC. (Neusch, Erik)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against OBN Logistics (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7873848)Attorney Erik R. Neusch added to party IHF, LLC(pty:pla), filed by IHF, LLC.(Neusch, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IHF, LLC v. OBN Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IHF, LLC
Represented By: Erik R. Neusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OBN Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?