Janome America, Inc. v. TV Vac Sew More Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janome America, Inc.
Defendant: TV VAC SEW MORE, INC., BLAKEMAN VACUUM AND SEWING, LLC, HAZEM MURIB, TV Vac Sew More Inc. doing business as More Than Vacuums doing business as Centennial Vac Inc 2.0, Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLC and V.A.C.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01359
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to V.A.C.S. LLC by Plaintiff Janome America, Inc.. (Day, Anna)
July 15, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Hazem Murib, TV Vac Sew More Inc., V.A.C.S. LLC, filed by Janome America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5a and 5b, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Day, Anna)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 10-6-2021 at 10:30am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9-28-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#5] is due 9-28-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7-14-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion for Leave. In light of [#15] confirming execution of service on Defendant Murib and Plaintiff's Notice [#17] informing the Court of the same, the Court finds this Motion moot. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7-12-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE re #13 MOTION for Leave to for Substituted Service by Mail Notice of Withdrawal by Plaintiff Janome America, Inc. (Day, Anna)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janome America, Inc.. TV Vac Sew More Inc. served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Day, Anna)
July 14, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janome America, Inc.. Hazem Murib served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (Day, Anna)
June 29, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLC. Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLC answer due 7/21/2021. (Weigler, Steven)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to for Substituted Service by Mail by Plaintiff Janome America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Day, Anna)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janome America, Inc.. TV Vac Sew More Inc. served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. (Day, Anna)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janome America, Inc.. Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLC served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Day, Anna)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven H. Weigler on behalf of Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLCAttorney Steven H. Weigler added to party Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLC(pty:dft) (Weigler, Steven)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to TV Vac Sew More Inc. by Plaintiff Janome America, Inc.. (Day, Anna)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLC by Plaintiff Janome America, Inc.. (Day, Anna)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hazem Murib by Plaintiff Janome America, Inc.. (Day, Anna)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (alave, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Janome America, Inc.. (Day, Anna)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLAKEMAN VACUUM AND SEWING, LLC, HAZEM MURIB, TV VAC SEW MORE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7874282)Attorney Anna S. Day added to party Janome America, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Janome America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Day, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janome America, Inc. v. TV Vac Sew More Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TV VAC SEW MORE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAKEMAN VACUUM AND SEWING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAZEM MURIB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TV Vac Sew More Inc. doing business as More Than Vacuums doing business as Centennial Vac Inc 2.0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blakeman Vacuum and Sewing LLC
Represented By: Steven H. Weigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.A.C.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janome America, Inc.
Represented By: Anna S. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?