Schober v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Schober
Defendant: Oliver Read, Edward J. Thompson, Claire L. Thompson, Paul Read, Hazel Davina Wells and Benedict Thompson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01382
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 28 PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1), by Defendant Oliver Read (alave, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 29 PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1), by Defendant Hazel Davina Wells (alave, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 27 PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1), by Defendant Paul Read (alave, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Benedict Thompson, Claire L. Thompson, Edward J. Thompson. (Donahue, Sarah)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/4/2021 CONSTRUING the unexpected illness impacting counsel for Defendants Benedict, Claire, and Edward Thompson ("Thompson Defendants") as set forth in the #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as an extraordinary circumstance justifying the requested extension. Accordingly, the #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. The Thompson Defendants shall file their Reply to their pending #11 Motion to Dismiss on or before August 6, 2021. The stipulated request for an extension of the deadline to exchange initial disclosures is also GRANTED, thereby extending the deadline through August 6, 2021. No further extensions shall be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Benedict Thompson, Claire L. Thompson, Edward J. Thompson. (Donahue, Sarah)
July 29, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Andrew Schober. (Palley, Stephen)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/20/2021. Text Only Entry(bwilk, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 21 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling/Status Conference held on 7/20/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Office of the Clerk shall convert the Stipulation #20 to a pending motion. The court GRANTS the motion and will extend the deadline to July 29, 2021. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #16 Response to Motion, #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Andrew Schober. (Ballard, Samuel) Modified on 7/20/2021 to convert to a pending motion pursuant to Minutes #21 (bwilk, ).
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Andrew Schober. (Palley, Stephen)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/12/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #16 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Paul Read, the Status Conference set for July 12, 2021 by this court's 15 Minute Order is hereby VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/09/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONDENTS PAUL READ JOINDER IN BENEDICT THOMPSON, EDWARD J. THOMPSON AND CLAIRE L.THOMPSON REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS #11 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Paul Read. (alave, )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: The #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Andrew Schober is signed by Plaintiff and all Defendants, but Defendant Paul Read has not entered his appearance in this matter. Mr. Read must enter his appearance before this court can effectuate the Parties' consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. The court encourages Mr. Read, as a pro se litigant, to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic cannot assist with criminal, bankruptcy, habeas, appeals, or any state cases. If Mr. Read wishes to avail himself of this service, he may make an appointment by phone (303-380-8786) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. In light of the Parties' failure to file a compliant Consent/Non-Consent Form by the July 6, 2021 deadline to do so, a Telephonic Status Conference is SET for 7/12/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, to be vacated upon the entry of Mr. Read's appearance. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976# at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/7/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Andrew Schober All parties consent.. (Ballard, Samuel)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER re: 12 Minute Order,,,,, by Plaintiff Andrew Schober. (Palley, Stephen)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/2/2021. This action is before the court sua sponte. Upon review of the Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants Oliver Read and Hazel Davina Wells, respectively #8 , #9 , it appears that one or both of these Defendants seek to proceed on behalf of Defendant Paul Read. It does not appear that either Oliver Read or Hazel Davina Wells are licensed attorneys or members of the Bar of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Accordingly, they may not represent Defendant Paul Read or file papers on his behalf. See Flymbo v. State Farm Fire & Cas. Co., 213 F.3d 1320, 1321 (10th Cir. 2000) ("A litigant may bring his own claims to federal court without counsel, but not the claims of others"). While Defendants Oliver Read and Hazel Davina Wells may proceed pro se in their respective individual capacities, none of the Defendants may proceed as a representative of another or all others without engaging in the unauthorized practice of law. Id. at 265. Thus, to the extent that Defendant Paul Read seeks to take any action with respect to the Complaint served upon him #4 , he must do so through licensed counsel or on his own. Text Only Entry (bwilk, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Benedict Thompson, Claire L. Thompson, Edward J. Thompson. (Donahue, Sarah)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Jackson Donahue on behalf of Benedict Thompson, Claire L. Thompson, Edward J. ThompsonAttorney Sarah Jackson Donahue added to party Benedict Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jackson Donahue added to party Claire L. Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jackson Donahue added to party Edward J. Thompson(pty:dft) (Donahue, Sarah)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hazel Davina Wells. (alave, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Oliver Read. (alave, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/24/21, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent. Consent Form due by 7/6/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/13/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/20/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Samuel Jonathan Leak Ballard on behalf of Andrew SchoberAttorney Samuel Jonathan Leak Ballard added to party Andrew Schober(pty:pla) (Ballard, Samuel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Schober. Benedict Thompson served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021; Claire L. Thompson served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021; Edward J. Thompson served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Palley, Stephen)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Schober. Oliver Read served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021; Paul Read served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021; Hazel Davina Wells served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Palley, Stephen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oliver Read, Paul Read, Benedict Thompson, Claire L. Thompson, Edward J. Thompson, Hazel Davina Wells (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7879457)Attorney Stephen David Palley added to party Andrew Schober(pty:pla), filed by Andrew Schober. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Palley, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schober v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Schober
Represented By: Stephen David Palley
Represented By: Samuel Jonathan Leake Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Thompson
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire L. Thompson
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Davina Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benedict Thompson
Represented By: Sarah Jackson Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?