Solo Sciences, Inc. v. Shah et al
Plaintiff: Solo Sciences, Inc.
Defendant: Ashesh Shah and Palle Pedersen
Case Number: 1:2021cv01390
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss On the Basis of Abstention Or Stay Pending Outcome of Parallel State Court Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Solo Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Olafson, Jon)
June 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss On the Basis of Abstention Or Stay Pending Outcome of Parallel State Court Proceedings by Defendants Palle Pedersen, Ashesh Shah. (Schlatter, Jennifer)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/21 granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The deadline forDefendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to June 29, 2021. Palle Pedersen answer due 6/29/2021; Ashesh Shah answer due 6/29/2021.(nmarb, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Palle Pedersen, Ashesh Shah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wolf, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew M. Wolf on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Matthew M. Wolf added to party Palle Pedersen(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew M. Wolf added to party Ashesh Shah(pty:dft) (Wolf, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer E. Schlatter on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jennifer E. Schlatter added to party Palle Pedersen(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer E. Schlatter added to party Ashesh Shah(pty:dft) (Schlatter, Jennifer)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/1/21, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/3/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/10/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-2] is August 27, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/1/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
May 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solo Sciences, Inc.. Ashesh Shah served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Olafson, Jon)
May 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solo Sciences, Inc.. Palle Pedersen served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Olafson, Jon)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olafson, Jon)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Solo Sciences, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7881017)Attorney Jon Jay Olafson added to party Solo Sciences, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Solo Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action to Ashesh Shah, #2 Summons Summons in a Civil Action to Palle Pedersen, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Olafson, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solo Sciences, Inc. v. Shah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solo Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Jay Olafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashesh Shah
Represented By: Jennifer E. Schlatter
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palle Pedersen
Represented By: Jennifer E. Schlatter
Represented By: Matthew M. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?