United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Legacy Group, Inc, The et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Andrea S. Trout, Matthew B. King, Randy R. King, Colorado Ventures I, LLC, Radiant Holdings, LLC and Legacy Group, Inc, The
Case Number: 1:2021cv01404
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Andrea Trout, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2021. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Matthew Brian King, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2021. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Randy Rene King, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2021. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Radiant Holdings, LLC, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2021. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Colorado Ventures I, LLC, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2021. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant The Legacy Group, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/11/2021. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Entry of Final Judgments as to All Defendants. The Final Judgments as to all Defendants shall be entered. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/11/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #5 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/11/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Andrew Chanin on behalf of Colorado Ventures I, LLC, Matthew B. King, Randy R. King, Legacy Group, Inc, The, Radiant Holdings, LLC, Andrea S. TroutAttorney John Andrew Chanin added to party Colorado Ventures I, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Andrew Chanin added to party Matthew B. King(pty:dft), Attorney John Andrew Chanin added to party Randy R. King(pty:dft), Attorney John Andrew Chanin added to party Legacy Group, Inc, The(pty:dft), Attorney John Andrew Chanin added to party Radiant Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Andrew Chanin added to party Andrea S. Trout(pty:dft) (Chanin, John)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment As To All Defendants by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Consent of Defendant Legacy Group, #2 Exhibit 2- Proposed Judgment as to Defendant Legacy Group, #3 Exhibit 3- Consent of Defendant Colorado Ventures, #4 Exhibit 4- Proposed Judgment as to Defendant Defendant Colorado Ventures, #5 Exhibit 5- Consent of Defendant Radiant Holdings, #6 Exhibit 6- Proposed Judgment as to Defendant Radiant Holdings, #7 Exhibit 7- Consent of Defendant Randy King, #8 Exhibit 8- Proposed Judgment as to Defendant Randy King, #9 Exhibit 9- Consent of Defendant Matthew King, #10 Exhibit 10- Proposed Judgment as to Defendant Matthew King, #11 Exhibit 11- Consent of Defendant Andrea Trout, #12 Exhibit 12- Proposed Judgment as to Defendant Andrea Trout)(Martin, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission All parties consent.. (Martin, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 7/21/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/21/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/25/2021. (evaug )
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colorado Ventures I, LLC, Matthew B. King, Randy R. King, Radiant Holdings, LLC, The Legacy Group, Inc, Andrea S. Trout Attorney Christopher Everett Martin added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Legacy Group, Inc, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea S. Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew B. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Ventures I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiant Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Group, Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Christopher Everett Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?