Schroeder et al v. Ellis et al
Plaintiff: Christina Schroeder, HBTC LLC, Mary Lauren Dobell and Scott Schroeder
Defendant: Robert Ellis, Ellen Miura, Gretchen Ellis and Steve Miura
Case Number: 1:2021cv01430
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/22/2021. (morti, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/22/2021. Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2022 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Mary Lauren Dobell, HBTC LLC, Christina Schroeder, Scott Schroeder. (Braig, Caleena)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/14/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Mary Lauren Dobell, HBTC LLC, Christina Schroeder, Scott Schroeder All parties consent.. (Laird, David)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint Attorney Patrick G. Compton added to party Gretchen Ellis (pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G. Compton added to party Robert Ellis (pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G. Compton added to party Ellen Miura (pty:dft), Attorney Patrick G. Compton added to party Steve Miura (pty:dft) by Gretchen Ellis, Robert Ellis, Ellen Miura, Steve Miura.(Compton, Patrick)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint Local Rule 6.1(a) Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Ellen Miura, Robert Ellis, Steve Miura, Gretchen Ellis. All Defendants. (Morr, Matthew)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/22/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/15/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/27/2021. (jgonz, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Caleena Svatek Braig on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Caleena Svatek Braig added to party Mary Lauren Dobell (pty:pla), Attorney Caleena Svatek Braig added to party HBTC LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Caleena Svatek Braig added to party Christina Schroeder (pty:pla), Attorney Caleena Svatek Braig added to party Scott Schroeder (pty:pla) (Braig, Caleena)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David A. Laird on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David A. Laird added to party Mary Lauren Dobell (pty:pla), Attorney David A. Laird added to party HBTC LLC (pty:pla), Attorney David A. Laird added to party Christina Schroeder (pty:pla), Attorney David A. Laird added to party Scott Schroeder (pty:pla) (Laird, David)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon Gretchen Ellis, Robert Ellis, Steve on 04/20/2021. (alave, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Gretchen Ellis, Robert Ellis, Ellen Miura, Steve Miura, filed by Christina Schroeder, HBTC LLC, Mary Lauren Dobell, Scott Schroeder.(alave, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ellen Miura, Robert Ellis, Steve Miura, Gretchen Ellis from District Court of Routt County, Colorado, Case Number 2021CV30034. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7887725), filed by Ellen Miura, Robert Ellis, Steve Miura, Gretchen Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Civil Case Cover Sheet), #2 Exhibit B (Summonses), #3 Exhibit C (Complaint with Exhibits 1-8), #4 Exhibit D (Affidavits of Service), #5 Exhibit E (Register of Actions), #6 Exhibit F (Declaration of Robert Ellis in Support of Notice of Removal), #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Morr, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroeder et al v. Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Schroeder
Represented By: David A. Laird
Represented By: Caleena Svatek Braig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HBTC LLC
Represented By: David A. Laird
Represented By: Caleena Svatek Braig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lauren Dobell
Represented By: David A. Laird
Represented By: Caleena Svatek Braig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Schroeder
Represented By: David A. Laird
Represented By: Caleena Svatek Braig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ellis
Represented By: Matthew A. Morr
Represented By: Patrick G. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Miura
Represented By: Matthew A. Morr
Represented By: Patrick G. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Ellis
Represented By: Matthew A. Morr
Represented By: Patrick G. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Miura
Represented By: Matthew A. Morr
Represented By: Patrick G. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?