McCollam v. Sunflower Bank, NA
Plaintiff: Karen McCollam
Defendant: Sunflower Bank, NA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01484
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sophia G. Gold on behalf of Karen McCollamAttorney Sophia G. Gold added to party Karen McCollam(pty:pla) (Gold, Sophia)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Taylor Brines on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney Ashley Taylor Brines added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Brines, Ashley)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew J. Demko on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney Andrew J. Demko added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Demko, Andrew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Sunflower Bank, NA All parties do not consent.. (Brown, Douglas)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Sunflower Bank, NA may have up to and including 8/21/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/1/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Sunflower Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Walker, David)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/23/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3 ) is due on or before 8/23/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/1/2021. Text Only Entry (amont, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Cameron Walker on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney David Cameron Walker added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Walker, David)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Wayne Brown on behalf of Sunflower Bank, NAAttorney Douglas Wayne Brown added to party Sunflower Bank, NA(pty:dft) (Brown, Douglas)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen McCollam. Sunflower Bank, NA served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sunflower Bank, N.A. by Plaintiff Karen McCollam. (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Jeffrey Kaliel. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against Sunflower Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7896653)Attorney Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel added to party Karen McCollam(pty:dft), filed by Karen McCollam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Deposit Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaliel, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCollam v. Sunflower Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McCollam
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia G. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunflower Bank, NA
Represented By: Andrew J. Demko
Represented By: Ashley Taylor Brines
Represented By: David Cameron Walker
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?